Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3584 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29618 Week
» 128263 Month
» 330927 Year
» 3357780 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8676 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
78676 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3155 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63155 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90476 |
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5077 |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 11/07/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
STOCK |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
02/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
29/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/10/1965 |
Doncaster Shed (Stored) |
Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. |
SLS/196511 |
10/12/1965 |
Doncaster MPD |
Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. |
SLS/196601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8676 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5077 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78676 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3155 |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63155 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90476 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90476 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |
|
|