Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3471 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29505 Week
» 128150 Month
» 330814 Year
» 3357667 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79211 |
m/e |
11/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3187 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63187 |
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
British Railways |
90508 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2307 |
Works Number |
5154 |
To Service |
During 11/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Austerities |
It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them. 280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944. |
SLS/194602 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79211 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5154 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3187 |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63187 |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90508 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90508 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |
|
|