Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 1047 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31697 Week
» 130342 Month
» 333006 Year
» 3359859 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79247 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3193 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63193 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
British Railways |
90514 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2308 |
Works Number |
5190 |
To Service |
During 01/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 23/01/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79247 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5190 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3193 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63193 |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90514 |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
23/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90514 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|