Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 479 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 479 Week
» 135295 Month
» 337959 Year
» 3364812 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5396 |
27/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27108 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (27/0) |
27052 |
12/12/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
27/06/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
04/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5396 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and a narrow white bodyside band at waist height. White window surrounds |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27108 |
|
|
12/12/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27052 |
|
|
01/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27052 |
|
|
09/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|