Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1230 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1230 Week
» 136046 Month
» 338710 Year
» 3365563 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6317 |
01/03/1960 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
22 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
B-B |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L97 |
Works Number |
27890 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
01/03/1960 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
23/09/1968 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
8 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 06/1969 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
01/03/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
08/02/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
03/06/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6317 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27890 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
23/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6317 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|