Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 362 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21396 Week
» 120041 Month
» 322705 Year
» 3349558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1722 |
m/e |
01/1901 |
British Railways |
31722 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 01/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/05/1962 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
17/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
01/02/1962 |
ALLOC |
73F |
Ashford |
4w/e |
01/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1722 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31722 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
17/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
01/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
05/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31722 |
|
|