Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 526 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 26560 Week
» 125205 Month
» 327869 Year
» 3354722 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8692 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
British Railways |
48692 |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/06/1968 |
Service Life |
24 yrs , 4 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8692 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48692 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
23/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48692 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|