Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 421 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 26455 Week
» 125100 Month
» 327764 Year
» 3354617 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
29 |
m/e |
08/1908 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Unclassified |
Company History |
CMDPR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Manning, Wardle & Co. |
To Service |
During 08/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 18/02/1954 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
Total Mileage |
307,402 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1908 |
KDR |
|
Kidderminster |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/02/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1966 |
Colwick MPD (Stored) |
Stored 44847/941/84, 45224/89, 48083/143/361/70/88/651/62/72. Also on shed Dept.29 in steam. |
SLS/196702 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 29 Built at Manning, Wardle & Co. |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kidderminster (KDR) |
|
|
18/02/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 29 |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|