|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/11/1959 | Brecon demotion | Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. | SLS/196002 |
02/07/1961 | Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/06/1940 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2217 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carmarthen (CARM) | ||
17/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) | ||
15/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G) | ||
13/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2217 | ||
04/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |