Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 3461 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30640 Week
» 21696 Month
» 368120 Year
» 3394973 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16608 |
m/e |
03/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7525 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47525 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
51 |
Works Number |
333 |
To Service |
During 03/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/03/1960 |
Service Life |
32 yrs , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1928 |
12E |
|
Moor Row |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
12D |
|
Workington |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
19/03/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
06/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
12E |
Moor Row |
w/e |
08/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
12D |
Workington |
4w/e |
07/08/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16608 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 333 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7525 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Moor Row (12E) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47525 |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47525 |
|
|
07/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|