Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3301 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30480 Week
» 21536 Month
» 367960 Year
» 3394813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16697 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7614 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47614 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
60 |
Works Number |
362 |
To Service |
During 11/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/07/1965 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
2w/e |
10/04/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16697 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 362 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7614 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47614 |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47614 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|