Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3542 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30721 Week
» 21777 Month
» 368201 Year
» 3395054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16724 |
m/e |
01/1929 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7641 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47641 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
60 |
Works Number |
389 |
To Service |
During 01/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 31/12/1966 |
Service Life |
38 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Wed 28/02/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16724 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 389 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7641 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Burton (17B) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47641 |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47641 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|