Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1565 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 28744 Week
» 19800 Month
» 366224 Year
» 3393077 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16734 |
m/e |
02/1929 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7651 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47651 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
60 |
Works Number |
399 |
To Service |
During 02/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/12/1963 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16734 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 399 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7651 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
30/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47651 |
|
|
13/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
07/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47651 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|