Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3470 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30649 Week
» 21705 Month
» 368129 Year
» 3394982 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16738 |
m/e |
03/1929 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7655 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47655 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
60 |
Works Number |
403 |
To Service |
During 03/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/11/1965 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16738 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 403 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7655 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea (Upper Bank) (4C) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47655 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47655 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|