|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) | Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). | SLS/195206 |
31/07/1961 | Bescot MPD (21B) (Stored) | Stored are 42421, 42940, 43963, 47296/363, 49021/77/99/126/275/343/411, 58119/204/283. Also possibly stored 40694 an 58122/3. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2256 | ||
07/1927 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9275 | ||
22/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) | ||
24/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
05/1953 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 49275 | ||
06/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
23/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
29/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 49275 |