Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2001 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 10945 Week
» 2001 Month
» 348425 Year
» 3375278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15567 |
on |
02/11/1932 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
68 |
on |
18/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40068 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 02/11/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/12/1959 off Willesden (1A) |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
21/05/1934 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
29/11/1952 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/11/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15567 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
18/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68 |
|
|
21/05/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40068 |
|
|
17/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40068 from Willesden (1A) |
|
|
07/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|