Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 109 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30759 Week
» 129404 Month
» 332068 Year
» 3358921 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2640 |
y/e |
1901 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
552 |
y/e |
1907 |
British Railways |
40552 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
60 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
2041 |
To Service |
During 1901 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 23/06/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
05/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
20/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
20E |
Manningham |
4w/e |
18/06/1955 |
ALLOC |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/06/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1906 |
H boiler fitted |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Bow Works |
|
21/04/1953 |
10/06/1953 |
51 days |
General |
|
|
Bow Works |
|
19/06/1953 |
24/06/1953 |
6 days |
Tender only |
|
|
Derby Works |
|
31/07/1956 |
15/08/1956 |
16 days |
Intermediate |
|
|
Gorton Works |
|
15/06/1960 |
23/06/1960 |
9 days |
Unknown Regime |
In for overhaul but was condemned instead
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1901 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2640 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
1906 |
Modification |
Modification: H boiler fitted |
|
|
1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 552 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40552 |
|
|
05/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
21/04/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Bow Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1953. Dep: 10/06/1953. |
|
|
19/06/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Bow Works (Tender only) - Arr: 19/06/1953. Dep: 24/06/1953. |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
28/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
31/07/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/07/1956. Dep: 15/08/1956. |
|
|
29/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
15/06/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 15/06/1960. Dep: 23/06/1960. Work undertaken: In for overhaul but was condemned instead
|
|
|
23/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40552 |
|
|
07/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|