Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1196 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1196 Week
» 136012 Month
» 338676 Year
» 3365529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4684 |
on |
02/12/1944 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
352 |
To Service |
Wed 02/12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 21/07/1965 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4684 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
21/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4684 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|