Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 1956 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 10900 Week
» 1956 Month
» 348380 Year
» 3375233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Metropolitan Railway |
112 |
on |
21/03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6159 |
|
04/10/1938 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Stratford |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/05/1941 |
Diagram 12 boiler fitted (number 1435) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Neasden |
|
1935 |
04/1935 |
|
General |
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
1938 |
04/10/1938 |
|
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6159
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
1941 |
05/1941 |
|
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Metropolitan Railway Number 112 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 703 Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 12 boiler fitted |
|
|
1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Neasden (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: ?/04/1935. |
|
|
1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 04/10/1938. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6159
|
|
|
1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: ?/05/1941. |
|
|
07/05/1941 |
Modification |
Diagram 12 number 1435 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/01/1943 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6159 from Neasden (NEA) |
|
|