|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1921 | 03/09/1921 | 124 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1924 | 21/06/1924 | 141 days | General | Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3462 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1926 | 04/11/1926 | 186 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1928 | 22/12/1928 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1930 | 25/02/1931 | 103 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1933 | 12/08/1933 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 7503 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1935 | 13/08/1935 | 75 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1937 | 07/07/1937 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1939 | 06/10/1939 | 67 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/09/1940 | 23/11/1940 | 77 days | General | Air raid damage Boiler number 9246 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1943 | 30/03/1943 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1945 | 16/03/1945 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1949 | 22/04/1949 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9467 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63480 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/06/1900 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 462 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22060 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
03/05/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1921. Dep: 03/09/1921. | ||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3462 |
||
03/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1926. Dep: 04/11/1926. | ||
25/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928. | ||
15/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1930. Dep: 25/02/1931. | ||
01/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7503 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1935. Dep: 13/08/1935. | ||
08/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1937. Dep: 07/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1939. Dep: 06/10/1939. | ||
08/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. Work undertaken: Air raid damage Boiler number 9246 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
04/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1943. Dep: 30/03/1943. | ||
31/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1945. Dep: 16/03/1945. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3480 | ||
02/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
26/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1949. Dep: 22/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9467 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63480 |
||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
03/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
26/03/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63480 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |