|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/06/1927 | 17/09/1927 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6574 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1929 | 11/01/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1932 | 20/08/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1935 | 23/03/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1937 | 10/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1944 | 28/10/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3751 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1947 | 22/11/1947 | 8 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1949 | 05/02/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63751 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1952 | 31/05/1952 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1955 | 17/03/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22891 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1955 | 20/03/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1957 | 02/03/1957 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1957 | 07/03/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1959 | 09/03/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1833 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21800 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6574 |
||
16/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
16/09/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
30/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1929. Dep: 11/01/1930. | ||
13/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
03/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
14/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3751 |
||
15/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947. | ||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
15/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 05/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63751 |
||
12/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (20C) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
10/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952. | ||
18/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
27/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
19/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1955. Dep: 17/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22891 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1955. Dep: 20/03/1955. | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
23/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957. | ||
05/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1957. Dep: 07/03/1957. | ||
09/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 09/03/1959. | ||
12/03/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63751 from Mexborough (41F) |