|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 13/03/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 26/07/1948 | 25/08/1948 | 31 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6699 (Diagram HC) |
86093 | |
Swindon Works | 21/12/1949 | 20/01/1950 | 31 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6692 (Diagram HC) |
144303 | |
Swindon Works | 20/04/1951 | 28/05/1951 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7611 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4049 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
207707 | |
Swindon Works | 05/09/1951 | 17/09/1951 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 03/10/1951 | 19/10/1951 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 07/05/1952 | 27/05/1952 | 21 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 22/04/1953 | 25/05/1953 | 34 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6694 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
301337 | |
Swindon Works | 01/06/1954 | 12/08/1954 | 73 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 11/12/1954 | 24/01/1955 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2779 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
378580 | |
Swindon Works | 03/09/1956 | 20/11/1956 | 79 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7622 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4092 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
457840 | |
Swindon Works | 12/05/1958 | 09/07/1958 | 59 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7623 (Diagram HC) |
533609 | |
Swindon Works | 23/03/1960 | 03/06/1960 | 73 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7692 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2754 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
632213 | |
Swindon Works | 15/01/1962 | 19/03/1962 | 64 days | Light Intermediate | Tender number 2427 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
735844 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos 1367, 1446, 2165, 2229/36, 2385, 2809/84/98, 3778, 3832/40/59, 4075/82, 4519/28/73/85, 4698, 4965/77/88, 5077, 5191, 5261, 5306, 5403, 5805, 5904/15/43, 6157, 6343/78, 6439, 6637, 6702, 6818/25/33/46/55, 7006, 7218, 7318, 7727, 7812, 8764/87, 9312/17, 9706/81; New work: Nos. 7014 BRD and 7015 SDN, both are painted G.W.R. green, as is No. 7016; the construction Of Nos. 4160-79 and 7430-39 is under way. During W/E 24/7 Nos. 5023, 6009 an 6910 were ex Works after having been in for the new British Railways' crest to be placed on the tenders, while during W/E 31/7 No. 5954 was ex general repair, having been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey together with the new crest on the tender. During W/E 14/8 Nos. 7016 Chester Castle CDF and 7430 STB were completed; No. 8393 also entered Works during this week. It is understood that the next batch of 'Castle's' (Nos. 7018-27) has been cancelled. Works' pilots lately have been and are: Nos. 906, 1758, 1900 an 2751; The following locomotives came in for cutting-up during W/E 24/7: Nos. 2680, 3002/27, 4386, 5127 an 5349 |
SLS/194809 |
04/03/1962 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/06/1946 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7006, name: LYDFORD CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Shrewsbury (4A) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HC boiler fitted |
||
13/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (SALOP) | ||
06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
30/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
26/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/07/1948. Dep: 25/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6699 (Diagram HC) |
||
25/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) | ||
14/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) | ||
01/12/1949 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2913 | ||
21/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/12/1949. Dep: 20/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6692 (Diagram HC) |
||
20/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
18/05/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4056 | ||
20/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/04/1951. Dep: 28/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7611 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4049 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
05/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/09/1951. Dep: 17/09/1951. | ||
03/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1951. Dep: 19/10/1951. | ||
07/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1952. Dep: 27/05/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/04/1953. Dep: 25/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6694 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/06/1954. Dep: 12/08/1954. | ||
11/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/12/1954. Dep: 24/01/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 2779 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/08/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4115 | ||
03/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/09/1956. Dep: 20/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7622 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4092 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
12/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/05/1958. Dep: 09/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7623 (Diagram HC) |
||
12/07/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4102 | ||
22/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
23/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/03/1960. Dep: 03/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7692 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2754 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
05/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
15/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/01/1962. Dep: 19/03/1962. Work undertaken: Tender number 2427 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
16/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7006 from Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Birds: Risca |