Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 1108 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31758 Week
» 130403 Month
» 333067 Year
» 3359920 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73080 |
m/e |
06/1955 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
06/1955 |
MERLIN |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73080, name: MERLIN Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
03/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
25/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73080 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|