Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1272 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1272 Week
» 136088 Month
» 338752 Year
» 3365605 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9729 |
on |
13/12/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
285 |
To Service |
Fri 13/12/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 23/10/1964 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/12/1934 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9729 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (83C) |
|
|
23/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9729 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|