Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1909 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | D33 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
331 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 10/1909 | 24/08/1951 | ||
864 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 10/1909 | 22/12/1949 | ||
865 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 10/1909 | 12/1947 | ||
866 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 11/1909 | 06/06/1952 | ||
867 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 11/1909 | 09/1949 | ||
894 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 11/1909 | 20/09/1951 | ||
332 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 12/1909 | 06/06/1951 | ||
333 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 12/1909 | 12/11/1952 | ||
382 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 12/1909 | 05/03/1948 | ||
383 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 01/1910 | 22/09/1953 | ||
384 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 02/1910 | 09/1947 | ||
385 | D33 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-0 | 02/1910 | 01/10/1951 |