Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1891 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | J36 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
655 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1891 | 04/1952 | ||
656 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1891 | 02/10/1961 | ||
657 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1891 | 02/12/1960 | ||
658 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1891 | 22/04/1967 | ||
659 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 08/1891 | 25/10/1961 | ||
660 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 08/1891 | 06/04/1956 |