Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 01/1891 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | Y9 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
50 | Y9 | NBR | 0-4-0ST | 01/1891 | 04/03/1953 | |||
63 | Y9 | NBR | 0-4-0ST | 01/1891 | 12/01/1955 | |||
227 | Y9 | NBR | 0-4-0ST | 01/1891 | 23/12/1958 | |||
231 | Y9 | NBR | 0-4-0ST | 06/1891 | 22/04/1954 | |||
232 | Y9 | NBR | 0-4-0ST | 06/1891 | 31/08/1961 | |||
610 | Y9 | NBR | 0-4-0ST | 06/1891 | 12/1923 |