Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1900 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | J36 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
777 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 03/1900 | 28/12/1963 | ||
778 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 03/1900 | 18/06/1962 | ||
779 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 03/1900 | 07/08/1963 | ||
780 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 03/1900 | 08/1947 | ||
781 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 05/1900 | 29/09/1959 | ||
782 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 05/1900 | 08/10/1962 |