Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1900 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | J36 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
789 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1900 | 29/07/1963 | ||
790 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1900 | 02/02/1960 | ||
791 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1900 | 18/02/1960 | ||
792 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1900 | 25/10/1962 | ||
793 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1900 | 05/06/1967 | ||
794 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1900 | 29/06/1964 |