Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1909 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | J88 |
Information | Safety valves on dome, combination injectors, 4 coal rails. |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
233 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 03/1909 | 16/08/1960 | ||
234 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 03/1909 | 21/03/1958 | ||
235 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 03/1909 | 03/06/1959 | ||
236 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 03/1909 | 08/10/1962 | ||
237 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 04/1909 | 28/05/1962 | ||
238 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 04/1909 | 08/11/1955 |