Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 12/1909 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | N1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1561 | 1256 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 03/1910 | 30/05/1955 | |
1562 | 1257 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 03/1910 | 06/09/1953 | |
1563 | 1258 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 03/1910 | 11/03/1959 | |
1564 | 1259 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 03/1910 | 22/10/1956 | |
1565 | 1260 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 04/1910 | 17/01/1955 | |
1566 | 1261 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 04/1910 | 15/06/1953 | |
1567 | 1262 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 04/1910 | 26/10/1956 | |
1568 | 1263 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 05/1910 | 12/01/1953 | |
1569 | 1264 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 05/1910 | 19/04/1955 | |
1570 | 1265 | N1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-2T | 05/1910 | 10/03/1959 |