Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1924 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J50 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3231 | 1583 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 02/1924 | 06/02/1961 | |
3233 | 1585 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 03/1924 | 12/12/1961 | |
3232 | 1586 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 02/1924 | 25/08/1961 | |
3234 | 1588 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 03/1924 | 12/12/1961 | |
3235 | 1590 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 03/1924 | 23/09/1963 | |
3236 | 1591 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 04/1924 | 23/09/1963 | |
3237 | 1593 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 04/1924 | 26/04/1961 | |
3238 | 1596 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 05/1924 | 23/09/1963 | |
3239 | 1597 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 05/1924 | 05/10/1959 | |
3240 | 1599 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 06/1924 | 29/10/1962 |