Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1926 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J50 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
583 | 1637 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 03/1926 | 15/09/1958 | |
586 | 1638 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 03/1926 | 13/12/1961 | |
588 | 1639 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 04/1926 | 19/09/1958 | |
589 | 1640 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 04/1926 | 20/02/1961 | |
591 | 1641 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 04/1926 | 17/09/1960 | |
593 | 1642 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 04/1926 | 21/04/1961 | |
594 | 1643 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 04/1926 | 23/02/1961 | |
596 | 1644 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 05/1926 | 20/02/1961 | |
601 | 1645 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 05/1926 | 15/11/1961 | |
603 | 1646 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 06/1926 | 14/04/1959 |