Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 08/1927 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | K3 |
Information | 1300 Series |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1300 | 1711 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 04/1929 | 12/07/1962 | |
1312 | 1712 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 05/1929 | 03/12/1962 | |
1318 | 1713 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1929 | 03/12/1962 | |
1331 | 1714 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1929 | 08/05/1962 | |
1345 | 1715 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1929 | 22/05/1961 | |
1364 | 1716 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1929 | 10/12/1962 | |
1365 | 1717 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1929 | 17/09/1959 | |
1367 | 1718 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1929 | 24/07/1962 | |
1368 | 1719 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1929 | 06/08/1959 | |
1386 | 1720 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1929 | 16/06/1959 |