Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 08/1927 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | K3 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1387 | 1721 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1929 | 16/09/1962 | |
1388 | 1722 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1929 | 21/04/1960 | |
1389 | 1723 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1929 | 28/05/1960 | |
1391 | 1724 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1929 | 03/12/1962 | |
1392 | 1725 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1929 | 23/07/1962 | |
1394 | 1726 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1929 | 03/11/1959 | |
1395 | 1727 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1929 | 16/09/1962 | |
1396 | 1728 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1929 | 02/03/1962 | |
1397 | 1729 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 12/1929 | 25/09/1961 | |
1398 | 1730 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 12/1929 | 04/11/1962 |