Manufacturer: St. Rollox Works
Builder | St. Rollox Works |
Order Date | 1912 |
For | 8 Steam locomotives |
Class | 782 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
651 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 10/1912 | 20/11/1948 | ||
781 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 11/1912 | 15/05/1959 | ||
130 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 11/1912 | 10/10/1958 | ||
131 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 12/1912 | 12/09/1957 | ||
171 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 10/1912 | 16/07/1962 | ||
172 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 11/1912 | 06/05/1960 | ||
173 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 11/1912 | 11/03/1960 | ||
174 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 12/1912 | 02/07/1957 |