Manufacturer: St. Rollox Works
Builder | St. Rollox Works |
Order Date | 1898 |
For | 14 Steam locomotives |
Class | 782 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
236 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 12/1898 | 07/1961 | ||
237 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 12/1898 | 20/01/1960 | ||
238 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 12/1898 | 07/1961 | ||
239 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 12/1898 | 08/02/1957 | ||
240 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 12/1898 | 28/05/1958 | ||
241 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 12/1898 | 02/1959 | ||
242 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 01/1899 | 10/04/1961 | ||
243 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 01/1899 | 07/01/1959 | ||
244 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 01/1899 | 07/01/1955 | ||
245 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 01/1899 | 10/1956 | ||
246 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 01/1899 | 02/1954 | ||
247 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 01/1899 | 11/1958 | ||
485 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 01/1899 | 03/1959 | ||
516 | 782 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0T | 01/1899 | 12/1958 |