Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1907 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 3150 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3151 | 2239 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1907 | 10/03/1952 | |
3152 | 2240 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1907 | 11/01/1947 | |
3153 | 2241 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1907 | 13/02/1953 | |
3154 | 2242 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1907 | 16/10/1950 | |
3155 | 2243 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1907 | 14/01/1960 | |
3156 | 2244 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1907 | 23/09/1957 | |
3157 | 2245 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1907 | 21/10/1952 | |
3158 | 2246 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1907 | 24/04/1948 | |
3159 | 2247 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1907 | 07/11/1949 | |
3160 | 2248 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1907 | 01/07/1953 | |
3161 | 2249 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1907 | 23/12/1952 | |
3162 | 2250 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1907 | 24/01/1947 | |
3163 | 2251 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 06/1907 | 24/06/1957 | |
3164 | 2252 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 06/1907 | 05/03/1956 | |
3165 | 2253 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 06/1907 | 03/07/1948 | |
3166 | 2254 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 06/1907 | 11/01/1947 | |
3167 | 2255 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 06/1907 | 02/08/1952 | |
3168 | 2256 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 06/1907 | 25/09/1950 | |
3169 | 2257 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 06/1907 | 06/07/1950 | |
3170 | 2258 | 3150 | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 06/1907 | 25/08/1958 |