Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1919 |
For | 24 Steam locomotives |
Class | 42xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4262 | 2842 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1919 | 20/04/1964 | |
4263 | 2843 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1919 | 14/02/1964 | |
4264 | 2844 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 10/1919 | 29/07/1963 | |
4265 | 2845 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 11/1919 | 24/06/1963 | |
4266 | 2846 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 11/1919 | 29/08/1962 | |
4267 | 2847 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 11/1919 | 23/10/1962 | |
4268 | 2848 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 11/1919 | 25/08/1965 | |
4269 | 2849 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1919 | 19/11/1962 | |
4270 | 2850 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1919 | 27/09/1962 | |
4271 | 2851 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 02/1920 | 16/12/1963 | |
4272 | 2852 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 28/02/1920 | 15/10/1963 | |
4273 | 2853 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1920 | 09/10/1964 | |
4274 | 2854 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1920 | 22/06/1962 | |
4275 | 2855 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1920 | 06/01/1964 | |
4276 | 2856 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1920 | 13/11/1962 | |
4277 | 2857 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1920 | 08/06/1964 | |
4278 | 2858 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 04/1920 | 06/07/1964 | |
4279 | 2859 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1920 | 15/01/1964 | |
4280 | 2860 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1920 | 22/01/1963 | |
4281 | 2861 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 05/1920 | 13/12/1960 | |
4282 | 2862 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 06/1920 | 10/09/1963 | |
4283 | 2863 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 06/1920 | 09/10/1964 | |
4284 | 2864 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1920 | 07/09/1964 | |
4285 | 2865 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1920 | 21/04/1965 |