Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1185 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 22219 Week
» 120864 Month
» 323528 Year
» 3350381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Wick
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Wick |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 32a | 28/07/1874 | 31/12/1948 | 60D | 01/01/1949 | 31/07/1962 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the south side of the station. The yard is partially
visible from the line.
Turn right outside the station along the approach road at the back
of the goods yard. Turn right along a cinder path at the far end of
this goods yard. This leads to the shed. Walking time less than 5
minutes.
Note.-Wick is 161¼ miles from Inverness by rail. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 28/07/1874 | Change of code to 32a | 01/01/1949 | Change of code to 60D |
|
|
|