Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 2165 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11109 Week
» 2165 Month
» 348589 Year
» 3375442 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Manningham
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Manningham |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 29 | 1875 | 31/12/1922 | M29 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 20E | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1957 | 55F | 01/02/1957 | 31/03/1967 |
|
Date Opened |
1872 |
Date Closed |
30/04/1967 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the east side of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
A path leads from the north end of the down platform to the shed.
There is also an entrance in Queens Road which runs over the south end
of the station. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1872 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 29 | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M29 | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 20E | 01/02/1957 | Change of code to 55F | 30/04/1967 | Depot closed |
|
|
|