Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 5573 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 16788 Week
» 7844 Month
» 354268 Year
» 3381121 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Abingdon
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Abingdon |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | oxf (21) | 02/06/1856 | 31/01/1950 | 81f | 01/02/1950 | 20/03/1954 |
|
Date Opened |
02/06/1856 |
Date Closed |
20/03/1954 |
Pre Grouping Company |
AbR |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
LONDON |
|
|