Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2492 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28526 Week
» 127171 Month
» 329835 Year
» 3356688 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: MRJ Philips at Crewe Works
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47534 |
24/04/1965 |
01/06/1991 |
26.121 |
4.041 |
|
|
06/1995 |
30.162 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47482 |
10/12/1964 |
20/10/1993 |
28.879 |
1.652 |
|
|
06/1995 |
30.532 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47470 |
22/06/1964 |
11/11/1991 |
27.405 |
3.595 |
|
|
06/1995 |
31.000 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47455 |
20/04/1964 |
15/03/1990 |
25.918 |
5.255 |
|
|
06/1995 |
31.173 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47521 |
19/10/1966 |
21/04/1995 |
28.523 |
0.233 |
|
|
07/1995 |
28.756 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47549 |
17/03/1964 |
01/08/1991 |
27.392 |
3.956 |
|
|
07/1995 |
31.348 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47444 |
11/03/1964 |
05/11/1990 |
26.671 |
4.693 |
|
|
07/1995 |
31.364 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47706 |
26/03/1966 |
01/04/1995 |
29.036 |
0.373 |
|
|
08/1995 |
29.408 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37681 |
25/03/1963 |
01/08/1992 |
29.375 |
3.038 |
|
|
08/1995 |
32.414 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47708 |
16/10/1965 |
01/04/1995 |
29.477 |
0.373 |
|
|
08/1995 |
29.849 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37008 |
10/02/1961 |
24/02/1992 |
31.058 |
4.392 |
|
|
07/1996 |
35.449 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47483 |
07/12/1964 |
11/06/1993 |
28.529 |
3.096 |
|
|
07/1996 |
31.625 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08470 |
07/11/1958 |
23/03/1986 |
27.392 |
10.405 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
08/1996 |
37.797 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47433 |
17/10/1963 |
03/05/1993 |
29.564 |
3.288 |
|
|
08/1996 |
32.852 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08177 |
14/05/1956 |
30/10/1988 |
32.485 |
7.797 |
YK |
York (North) |
08/1996 |
40.282 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47443 |
14/03/1964 |
01/10/1993 |
29.570 |
3.167 |
|
|
30/11/1996 |
32.737 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47463 |
25/05/1964 |
21/04/1995 |
30.926 |
1.619 |
|
|
02/12/1996 |
32.545 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47320 |
14/01/1965 |
10/08/1993 |
28.589 |
3.321 |
|
|
04/12/1996 |
31.910 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47063 |
02/01/1965 |
22/09/1995 |
30.740 |
1.203 |
|
|
04/12/1996 |
31.942 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31970 |
18/10/1962 |
01/09/1991 |
28.890 |
5.540 |
|
|
03/1997 |
34.430 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
97204 |
18/10/1962 |
01/09/1991 |
28.890 |
5.540 |
|
|
03/1997 |
34.430 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47421 |
05/06/1963 |
27/09/1991 |
28.332 |
5.468 |
|
|
03/1997 |
33.800 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47485 |
31/10/1963 |
06/10/1993 |
29.953 |
3.441 |
|
|
03/1997 |
33.395 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47538 |
20/03/1965 |
01/09/1990 |
25.468 |
6.540 |
|
|
03/1997 |
32.008 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47561 |
25/08/1964 |
01/08/1996 |
31.956 |
0.619 |
|
|
03/1997 |
32.575 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47439 |
27/02/1964 |
06/04/1993 |
29.126 |
3.942 |
|
|
03/1997 |
33.068 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47466 |
30/05/1964 |
01/08/1991 |
27.189 |
5.625 |
|
|
03/1997 |
32.814 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47442 |
26/02/1964 |
12/03/1993 |
29.060 |
4.096 |
|
|
04/1997 |
33.156 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47850 |
19/06/1964 |
01/10/1995 |
31.304 |
1.789 |
|
|
07/1997 |
33.093 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37699 |
05/01/1965 |
01/08/1997 |
32.592 |
-0.047 |
|
|
07/1997 |
32.545 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37333 |
16/09/1965 |
01/08/1997 |
31.896 |
-0.047 |
|
|
07/1997 |
31.849 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37066 |
16/11/1962 |
15/08/1997 |
34.770 |
0.000 |
|
|
15/08/1997 |
34.770 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08849 |
14/05/1961 |
01/10/1993 |
32.405 |
3.923 |
LA |
Laira |
02/09/1997 |
36.329 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47473 |
06/07/1964 |
01/06/1998 |
33.926 |
-0.214 |
|
|
03/1998 |
33.712 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47340 |
10/03/1965 |
01/06/1998 |
33.249 |
-0.214 |
|
|
03/1998 |
33.036 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31551 |
02/08/1962 |
01/03/1996 |
33.603 |
2.542 |
|
|
09/1998 |
36.145 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31165 |
21/01/1960 |
21/01/2000 |
40.027 |
-1.351 |
|
|
09/1998 |
38.677 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56028 |
14/09/1977 |
26/11/1993 |
16.211 |
4.805 |
|
|
09/1998 |
21.016 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56030 |
21/10/1977 |
26/11/1993 |
16.110 |
4.805 |
|
|
09/1998 |
20.915 |