Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 742 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31392 Week
» 130037 Month
» 332701 Year
» 3359554 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #229
Pre Grouping Company |
GER |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
40 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Y4 |
210 |
|
01/1921 |
Y4 |
7229 |
|
05/02/1936 |
Y4 |
7228 |
|
05/05/1942 |
Y4 |
7229 |
|
18/08/1945 |
Y4 |
8126 |
|
06/06/1947 |
|