Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 391 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 391 Week
» 135207 Month
» 337871 Year
» 3364724 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7792
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94 |
Firebox Type |
Round Top |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2570 |
TRANQUIL |
27/09/1924 |
A1 |
2574 |
ST FRUSQUIN |
05/12/1929 |
A1 |
4473 |
SOLARIO |
07/06/1932 |
A1 |
2554 |
WOOLWINDER |
24/11/1934 |
A1 |
2555 |
CENTENARY |
22/10/1936 |
|