Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2147 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 2147 Week
» 136963 Month
» 339627 Year
» 3366480 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7686
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
3 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
K2 |
4656 |
|
16/08/1924 |
K2 |
4666 |
|
25/04/1931 |
K2 |
4679 |
|
28/10/1933 |
K2 |
4649 |
|
27/10/1934 |
K2 |
4669 |
|
31/05/1941 |
K2 |
4642 |
|
02/12/1944 |
|