Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 561 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31211 Week
» 129856 Month
» 332520 Year
» 3359373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2200
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
55Sup |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A7 |
1174 |
|
03/01/1930 |
A7 |
1181 |
|
20/09/1934 |
A7 |
1175 |
|
26/09/1942 |
A7 |
1183 |
|
29/09/1944 |
A7 |
9770 |
|
29/06/1946 |
A7 |
69781 |
|
20/08/1948 |
|