Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1440 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1440 Week
» 136256 Month
» 338920 Year
» 3365773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29316
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
107 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A4 |
60027 |
MERLIN |
06/06/1952 |
A4 |
60001 |
SIR RONALD MATTHEWS |
04/08/1955 |
A4 |
60030 |
GOLDEN FLEECE |
23/01/1957 |
A4 |
60012 |
COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA |
18/07/1958 |
A4 |
60027 |
MERLIN |
19/05/1960 |
A4 |
60032 |
GANNET |
22/03/1962 |
|