Clayton 17 Bo-Bo
BR (Pre Tops) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
D8500 | 10/09/1962 | 66A 52H 66A 12A 12A D10 R W |
Polmadie (New) Tyne Dock Polmadie Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Withdrawn |
10/09/1962 07/09/1963 30/09/1963 19/08/1967 09/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 18/05/1969 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D8501 | 10/10/1962 | 66A 52H 56B 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Tyne Dock Ardsley Polmadie Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
10/10/1962 07/09/1963 14/09/1963 05/10/1963 19/08/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8502 | 06/10/1962 | 66A 12A D10 64B 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
06/10/1962 19/08/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 30/11/1968 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8503 | 10/10/1962 | 66A 12A D10 R W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Withdrawn |
10/10/1962 19/08/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 12/10/1968 08/11/1969 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8504 | 17/10/1962 | 66A 12A D10 R W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Withdrawn |
17/10/1962 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 24/05/1969 07/11/1971 |
07/11/1971 |
D8505 | 17/10/1962 | 66A 12A D10 R 64B W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Haymarket Withdrawn |
17/10/1962 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 24/05/1969 30/08/1969 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8506 | 24/10/1962 | 66A 12A 12A D10 R R W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Reinstated Withdrawn |
24/10/1962 09/09/1967 10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 05/1969 05/1969 02/11/1969 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8507 | 30/10/1962 | 66A 12A D10 R 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Polmadie Withdrawn |
30/10/1962 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/11/1969 25/12/1971 31/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8508 | 30/10/1962 | 66A 12A D10 R W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Withdrawn |
30/10/1962 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 24/05/1969 31/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8509 | 13/11/1962 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
13/11/1962 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8510 | 13/11/1962 | 66A 12A 12A D10 12A R R W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Carlisle Kingmoor (loan made permanent) Preston Division Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Reinstated Reinstated Withdrawn |
13/11/1962 25/11/1967 12/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 31/10/1968 28/12/1968 02/11/1969 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D8511 | 22/11/1962 | 66A 12A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Carlisle Kingmoor (loan made permanent) Preston Division Withdrawn |
22/11/1962 25/11/1967 12/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8512 | 07/12/1962 | 66A 12A D10 R W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Withdrawn |
07/12/1962 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 02/11/1968 28/12/1968 |
28/12/1968 |
D8513 | 07/12/1962 | 66A 12A D10 R W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Withdrawn |
07/12/1962 21/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 24/05/1969 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8514 | 09/07/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
09/07/1963 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 02/11/1968 |
02/11/1968 |
D8515 | 03/08/1963 | 66A 12A D10 64B 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
03/08/1963 28/10/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 30/11/1968 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8516 | 19/04/1963 | 66A 12A D10 R 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Polmadie Withdrawn |
19/04/1963 04/11/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/11/1969 08/11/1969 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8517 | 29/06/1963 | 66A 12A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Carlisle Kingmoor (loan made permanent) Preston Division Withdrawn |
29/06/1963 25/11/1967 12/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8518 | 19/04/1963 | 66A 12A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Carlisle Kingmoor (loan made permanent) Preston Division Withdrawn |
19/04/1963 11/11/1967 12/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8519 | 18/07/1963 | 66A 12A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Carlisle Kingmoor (loan made permanent) Preston Division Withdrawn |
18/07/1963 11/11/1967 12/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8520 | 17/05/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
17/05/1963 16/12/1967 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8521 | 23/07/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
23/07/1963 13/01/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8522 | 03/07/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
03/07/1963 13/01/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8523 | 09/07/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
09/07/1963 13/01/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8524 | 16/07/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
16/07/1963 13/01/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8525 | 14/08/1963 | 66A 12A D10 64B 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
14/08/1963 13/01/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 30/11/1968 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8526 | 20/08/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
20/08/1963 30/03/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8527 | 29/08/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
29/08/1963 30/03/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 28/12/1968 |
28/12/1968 |
D8528 | 23/07/1963 | 66A 12A D10 R W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Withdrawn |
23/07/1963 30/03/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/11/1969 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8529 | 17/05/1963 | 66A 12A D10 R R R 66A |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Reinstated Reinstated Polmadie |
17/05/1963 30/03/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 02/11/1968 08/11/1969 07/11/1971 25/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8530 | 26/04/1963 | 66A 12A D10 66A R W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Polmadie Reinstated Withdrawn |
26/04/1963 30/03/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 31/05/1969 06/1969 11/10/1969 03/03/1971 |
03/03/1971 |
D8531 | 08/05/1963 | 66A 12A D10 R 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Reinstated Polmadie Withdrawn |
08/05/1963 30/03/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 08/11/1969 08/11/1969 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8532 | 29/07/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
29/07/1963 30/03/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 28/12/1968 |
28/12/1968 |
D8533 | 03/08/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
03/08/1963 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8534 | 12/06/1963 | 66A 12A D10 W |
Polmadie (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
12/06/1963 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 |
12/10/1968 |
D8535 | 18/07/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
18/07/1963 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D8536 | 29/08/1963 | 66A 52H 56B 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Tyne Dock Ardsley Polmadie Withdrawn |
29/08/1963 07/09/1963 14/09/1963 05/10/1963 31/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8537 | 12/06/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
12/06/1963 21/07/1968 |
21/07/1968 |
D8538 | 21/06/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
21/06/1963 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8539 | 12/06/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
12/06/1963 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8540 | 20/08/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
20/08/1963 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8541 | 29/06/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
29/06/1963 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8542 | 06/09/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
06/09/1963 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8543 | 10/09/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
10/09/1963 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8544 | 10/09/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
10/09/1963 28/06/1969 |
28/06/1969 |
D8545 | 17/09/1963 | 66A 64H 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Leith Central Polmadie Withdrawn |
17/09/1963 05/10/1963 30/11/1963 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8546 | 17/09/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
17/09/1963 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8547 | 27/09/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
27/09/1963 02/1969 |
02/1969 |
D8548 | 27/09/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
27/09/1963 31/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8549 | 08/10/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
08/10/1963 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8550 | 08/11/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
08/11/1963 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8551 | 08/10/1963 | 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Withdrawn |
08/10/1963 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8552 | 17/10/1963 | 66A 64B 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
17/10/1963 24/06/1967 26/08/1967 31/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8553 | 17/10/1963 | 66A 64B 66A W |
Polmadie (New) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
17/10/1963 24/06/1967 26/08/1967 27/10/1968 |
27/10/1968 |
D8554 | 24/10/1963 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
24/10/1963 26/08/1967 28/06/1969 |
28/06/1969 |
D8555 | 29/10/1963 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
29/10/1963 26/08/1967 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8556 | 29/10/1963 | 64B 66A 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
29/10/1963 26/08/1967 26/08/1967 30/09/1967 02/1969 |
02/1969 |
D8557 | 08/11/1963 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
08/11/1963 30/09/1967 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8558 | 08/11/1963 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
08/11/1963 30/09/1967 31/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8559 | 12/11/1963 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
12/11/1963 30/09/1967 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8560 | 12/11/1963 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
12/11/1963 30/12/1967 02/1969 |
02/1969 |
D8561 | 22/11/1963 | 64B 66A 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Haymarket Withdrawn |
22/11/1963 27/01/1968 29/11/1969 07/11/1971 |
07/11/1971 |
D8562 | 22/11/1963 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
22/11/1963 30/03/1968 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8563 | 20/12/1963 | 64B 66A 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
20/12/1963 30/03/1968 29/11/1969 25/12/1971 31/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8564 | 20/12/1963 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
20/12/1963 01/06/1968 16/02/1969 |
16/02/1969 |
D8565 | 21/12/1963 | 64B 66A 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Haymarket Withdrawn |
21/12/1963 01/06/1968 29/11/1969 01/11/1971 |
07/11/1971 |
D8566 | 21/12/1963 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
21/12/1963 01/06/1968 04/12/1968 |
04/12/1968 |
D8567 | 06/01/1964 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
06/01/1964 01/06/1968 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8568 | 06/01/1964 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
06/01/1964 28/09/1968 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8569 | 10/01/1964 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
10/01/1964 28/09/1968 04/12/1968 |
04/12/1968 |
D8570 | 10/01/1964 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
10/01/1964 28/09/1968 24/11/1968 |
24/11/1968 |
D8571 | 20/01/1964 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
20/01/1964 25/01/1969 28/06/1969 |
28/06/1969 |
D8572 | 20/01/1964 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
20/01/1964 25/01/1969 28/06/1969 |
28/06/1969 |
D8573 | 30/01/1964 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
30/01/1964 25/01/1969 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8574 | 30/01/1964 | 64B 66A R W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Reinstated Withdrawn |
30/01/1964 01/03/1969 07/11/1971 31/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8575 | 12/02/1964 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
12/02/1964 27/10/1968 |
27/10/1968 |
D8576 | 12/02/1964 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
12/02/1964 31/01/1969 28/02/1969 |
28/02/1969 |
D8577 | 18/02/1964 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
18/02/1964 02/1969 |
02/1969 |
D8578 | 03/03/1964 | 64B 66A W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Withdrawn |
03/03/1964 01/03/1969 28/06/1969 |
28/06/1969 |
D8579 | 03/03/1964 | 64B 66A 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Haymarket Withdrawn |
03/03/1964 01/03/1969 29/11/1969 04/10/1971 |
04/10/1971 |
D8580 | 11/03/1964 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
11/03/1964 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8581 | 24/03/1964 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
24/03/1964 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8582 | 31/03/1964 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
31/03/1964 25/01/1969 |
25/01/1969 |
D8583 | 17/04/1964 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
17/04/1964 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8584 | 28/05/1964 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
28/05/1964 29/10/1968 |
29/10/1968 |
D8585 | 14/05/1964 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
14/05/1964 29/10/1968 |
29/10/1968 |
D8586 | 11/12/1964 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
11/12/1964 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8587 | 05/02/1965 | 64B W |
Haymarket (New) Withdrawn |
05/02/1965 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8588 | 20/03/1964 | 51L 52A 64B W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Haymarket Withdrawn |
20/03/1964 16/07/1966 01/05/1971 04/10/1971 |
04/10/1971 |
D8589 | 04/05/1964 | 51L 52A W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Withdrawn |
04/05/1964 16/07/1966 06/07/1970 |
06/07/1970 |
D8590 | 12/05/1964 | 51L 52A W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Withdrawn |
12/05/1964 16/07/1966 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D8591 | 08/07/1964 | 51L 52A W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Withdrawn |
08/07/1964 16/07/1966 22/12/1968 |
22/12/1968 |
D8592 | 12/05/1964 | 52A 64B W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Withdrawn |
12/05/1964 12/06/1971 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8593 | 28/05/1964 | 52A 64B W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Withdrawn |
28/05/1964 12/06/1971 04/10/1971 |
04/10/1971 |
D8594 | 03/07/1964 | 52A 64B W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Withdrawn |
03/07/1964 29/05/1971 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |
D8595 | 21/07/1964 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
21/07/1964 22/12/1968 |
22/12/1968 |
D8596 | 28/07/1964 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
28/07/1964 22/12/1968 |
22/12/1968 |
D8597 | 21/07/1964 | 52A 64B W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Withdrawn |
21/07/1964 29/05/1971 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8598 | 06/08/1964 | 52A 64B R 66A W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Reinstated Polmadie Withdrawn |
06/08/1964 29/05/1971 07/11/1971 25/12/1971 31/12/1971 |
31/12/1971 |
D8599 | 28/08/1964 | 52A 51L 52A 64B W |
Gateshead (New) Thornaby Gateshead Haymarket Withdrawn |
28/08/1964 27/04/1968 08/03/1969 01/05/1971 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8600 | 06/08/1964 | 52A 51L 52A 64B W |
Gateshead (New) Thornaby Gateshead Haymarket Withdrawn |
06/08/1964 27/04/1968 08/03/1969 01/05/1971 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8601 | 02/09/1964 | 52A 51L 52A 64B W |
Gateshead (New) Thornaby Gateshead Haymarket Withdrawn |
02/09/1964 24/02/1968 21/03/1970 12/06/1971 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8602 | 09/09/1964 | 52A 51L 52A 64B W |
Gateshead (New) Thornaby Gateshead Haymarket Withdrawn |
09/09/1964 24/02/1968 09/05/1970 01/05/1971 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8603 | 07/09/1964 | 52A 51L 52A 64B W |
Gateshead (New) Thornaby Gateshead Haymarket Withdrawn |
07/09/1964 27/04/1968 09/05/1970 01/05/1971 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8604 | 15/09/1964 | 41A 41E 64B 52A 91N 51L 52A 64B W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Gateshead To North Eastern Region Thornaby Gateshead Haymarket Withdrawn |
15/09/1964 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 24/06/1967 30/12/1967 24/02/1968 09/05/1970 12/06/1971 04/10/1971 |
04/10/1971 |
D8605 | 01/10/1964 | 41A 41E 64B 52A 91N 51L W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Gateshead To North Eastern Region Thornaby Withdrawn |
01/10/1964 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 24/06/1967 30/12/1967 24/02/1968 28/10/1968 |
28/10/1968 |
D8606 | 05/10/1964 | 41A 41E 64B W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Withdrawn |
05/10/1964 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D8607 | 16/10/1964 | 41A 41E 64B 66A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
16/10/1964 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 29/05/1971 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8608 | 27/10/1964 | 41A 41E 64B 66A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
27/10/1964 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 29/05/1971 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8609 | 23/11/1964 | 41A 41E 64B W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Withdrawn |
23/11/1964 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 13/10/1968 |
13/10/1968 |
D8610 | 07/12/1964 | 41A 41E 64B 66A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
07/12/1964 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 29/05/1971 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8611 | 17/12/1964 | 41A 41E 64B W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Withdrawn |
17/12/1964 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 13/10/1968 |
13/10/1968 |
D8612 | 27/01/1965 | 41A 41E 64B 66A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
27/01/1965 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 29/05/1971 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8613 | 22/01/1965 | 41A 41E 64B 66A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
22/01/1965 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 29/05/1971 06/10/1971 |
06/10/1971 |
D8614 | 11/02/1965 | 41A 41E 64B 66A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
11/02/1965 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 29/05/1971 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8615 | 10/03/1965 | 41A 41E 64B 66A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
10/03/1965 10/04/1965 28/05/1966 29/05/1971 05/10/1971 |
05/10/1971 |
D8616 | 23/04/1965 | 41E 64B 66A W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) (New) Haymarket Polmadie Withdrawn |
23/04/1965 28/05/1966 29/05/1971 21/09/1971 |
21/09/1971 |