Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3779 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 20642 Week
» 11698 Month
» 358122 Year
» 3384975 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
71 Bo-Bo
Old Number |
Company |
Old Num Type |
New Number |
Company |
Subtype |
New Num Type |
|
Date |
5000 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
5024 |
BR |
Main |
Pre TOPS |
on |
16/12/1962 |
5016 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6102 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
on |
05/11/1967 |
5006 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6103 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
on |
10/12/1967 |
5015 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6101 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
on |
11/02/1968 |
5024 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6104 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/02/1968 |
5019 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6105 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
on |
10/03/1968 |
5023 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6106 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
on |
17/03/1968 |
5003 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6107 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
on |
31/03/1968 |
5005 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6108 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
on |
07/04/1968 |
5017 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6109 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
on |
28/04/1968 |
5021 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
6110 |
BR |
74 Pre-TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
06/1968 |
5022 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
5006 |
BR |
2nd |
Pre TOPS |
on |
13/10/1968 |
5020 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
5005 |
BR |
2nd |
Pre TOPS |
on |
31/10/1968 |
5018 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
5003 |
BR |
2nd |
Pre TOPS |
on |
15/12/1968 |
6105 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74005 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
5003 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71003 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
5014 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71014 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
6101 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74001 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
5005 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71005 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
5006 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71006 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
5011 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71011 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
5010 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71010 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
5008 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71008 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
6104 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74004 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
5002 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71002 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
12/1973 |
5012 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71012 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
5013 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71013 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
6109 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74009 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
on |
01/1974 |
5009 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71009 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
5007 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71007 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
5001 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71001 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
5004 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
71004 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
6106 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74006 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
6110 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74010 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
6107 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74007 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
6108 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74008 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
6103 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74003 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
6102 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
74002 |
BR |
74 TOPS |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |